Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 06/11/2003
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 06/11/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/11/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/18/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/18/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/08/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/08/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/08/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/08/2003
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/08/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/09/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/17/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/22/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 07/22/2003
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 09/10/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/10/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/08/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 01/20/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/29/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/23/2004
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/23/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 09/23/2004
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/23/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/29/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/07/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/07/2004