Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/10/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/10/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 07/10/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/14/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/14/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/14/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/14/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/14/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/14/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/14/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/23/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/23/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/23/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/23/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/23/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/23/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/23/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/23/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 07/23/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/23/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/23/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/23/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/23/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/23/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/23/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/23/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/23/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/23/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/23/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/23/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/23/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/23/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/23/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/23/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/23/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/23/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/23/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/23/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/23/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/23/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/23/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/23/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/23/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/23/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/30/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/30/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/30/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 10/30/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/30/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 10/30/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/30/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/30/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/24/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/24/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 02/24/2004
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/24/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/24/2004
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 02/24/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/24/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/24/2004
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/24/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/24/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/24/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/24/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/24/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/24/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/24/2004
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/24/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/24/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/24/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/24/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/24/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/24/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/24/2004
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 02/24/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/24/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/24/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/24/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/24/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/24/2004
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 02/24/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/24/2004
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 02/24/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/24/2004
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 02/24/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/24/2004
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/24/2004
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/24/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/24/2004
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/09/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/09/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/09/2004
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/09/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/09/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/09/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/09/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/09/2004
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/09/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/09/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/09/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/09/2004
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/18/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/18/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/18/2004
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/18/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/18/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/18/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/18/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/29/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/29/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/29/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/29/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/29/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/29/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 03/29/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/29/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/29/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/29/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/29/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/29/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/29/2004
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/29/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/02/2004
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/02/2004
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 04/02/2004
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/02/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/02/2004
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/02/2004
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 04/02/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/02/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/02/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/02/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/02/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 04/02/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/02/2004
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/02/2004
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/04/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/04/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/04/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/04/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/04/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/04/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/04/2004
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/04/2004
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/04/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/04/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/04/2004
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 05/06/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/06/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/06/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 05/06/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/20/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 05/20/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/20/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/20/2004
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/18/2004
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/18/2004
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/13/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/13/2004
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/13/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/13/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/13/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/14/2004
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/28/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/20/2004
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 11/20/2004
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 11/20/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/20/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 11/20/2004