Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/12/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 06/12/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 06/12/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 06/12/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/25/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/25/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/25/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/25/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 07/08/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/03/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/03/2003
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 11/18/2003