Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5]* 06/12/2003
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 06/12/2003
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/08/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/22/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/22/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/21/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 11/21/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 11/21/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/16/2004
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 03/16/2004