Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 01/08/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/12/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/08/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 06/18/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/23/2003