Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 06/12/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 06/12/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/12/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 06/12/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/16/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/16/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/16/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/16/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/16/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/16/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/16/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/16/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 06/16/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/16/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/17/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 06/17/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/17/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/17/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/18/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/18/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/18/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/18/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/18/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/19/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/19/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/24/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/24/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/24/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/24/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/24/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/24/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 06/24/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/24/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/24/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/24/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/25/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/25/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/25/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/25/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/26/2003
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 06/26/2003
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/08/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/08/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/08/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/08/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/09/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/09/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/09/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/09/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/10/2003
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/10/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/10/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/10/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/10/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/14/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 07/14/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/14/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/15/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/15/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/16/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/16/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/17/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/17/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/18/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/18/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/22/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/22/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/22/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/22/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/25/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 07/25/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/25/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 07/25/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/25/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/09/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/09/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/24/2003