Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 06/16/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 06/16/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 06/16/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 06/16/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 06/16/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1]* 06/16/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 06/16/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 06/16/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 06/16/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 06/16/2003
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 06/16/2003
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 06/16/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 06/16/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 06/16/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/16/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 06/16/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/16/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 06/16/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 06/16/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 06/16/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 06/16/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 06/16/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 06/16/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 06/16/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 06/16/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 06/16/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 06/16/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 06/16/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 06/16/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 06/16/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 06/16/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29]* 06/16/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 06/16/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 06/16/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 06/16/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 06/16/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 06/16/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 06/16/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/18/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/19/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/24/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/24/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/25/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 07/07/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/30/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 03/10/2004
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 11/16/2004