Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 06/17/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 06/17/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 06/17/2003
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 06/17/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 06/17/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/17/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/19/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/25/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/18/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/05/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/05/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/05/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/10/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/10/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/10/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/10/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/16/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/24/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/02/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/15/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/04/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/04/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/04/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/04/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 11/04/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 11/05/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/07/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/08/2003
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 01/21/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/21/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/24/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/03/2004
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/10/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/16/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/23/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/01/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/21/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/26/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/11/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/20/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 06/15/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/22/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/21/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/09/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/09/2004
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/09/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/23/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/05/2004
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 10/08/2004
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 10/08/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/17/2004