Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 06/17/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/17/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/19/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/19/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/24/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/24/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/24/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/25/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/08/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/08/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/08/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 07/08/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 07/08/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/14/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/14/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/15/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/16/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/16/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/16/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 07/16/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/17/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/17/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/17/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/22/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 02/25/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/25/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/20/2004