Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 10/08/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/08/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 10/08/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/08/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/08/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 10/21/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 11/21/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 11/21/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 01/21/2004
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 02/26/2004
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/16/2004
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/04/2004
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/08/2004
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/12/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/22/2004
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 09/08/2004
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/22/2004
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/18/2004
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 11/19/2004