Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 06/19/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 06/19/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/19/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 06/19/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/19/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/19/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 06/19/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/19/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/19/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/19/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/26/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/26/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/26/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/26/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/08/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/08/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/08/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/08/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/08/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 07/08/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/15/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/15/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/15/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/15/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 07/24/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/24/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/04/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/23/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/07/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/17/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/17/2003
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 11/17/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 01/21/2004
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 01/21/2004
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 01/21/2004
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 01/21/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/24/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/01/2004
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 04/20/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/09/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/23/2004