Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 06/19/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/22/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 07/24/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/24/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/04/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/10/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/30/2003