Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 06/19/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 06/19/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/19/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/17/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/17/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/17/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/17/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/17/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/21/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/21/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 07/23/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/24/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 09/03/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/03/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/03/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/03/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/03/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/03/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/04/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/05/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/09/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/10/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 09/10/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/16/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/16/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/23/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/15/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 10/30/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/05/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 11/17/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/17/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 11/17/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 11/17/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 11/21/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/20/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 01/20/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 01/21/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 01/21/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/27/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/04/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/24/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/09/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/30/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/20/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/22/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/04/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/17/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/17/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/17/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/17/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/18/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/18/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/18/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/18/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 05/18/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/19/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/19/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/02/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/02/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/02/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/02/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/23/2004