Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 06/19/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/19/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/19/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/25/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/25/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/03/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/04/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/04/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/11/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/11/2004
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 03/16/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/16/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/16/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/16/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/29/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/29/2004
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 03/29/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/29/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/29/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/29/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/22/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/04/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/18/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/15/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/15/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/24/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 06/24/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/24/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/20/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/20/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/09/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/09/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/09/2004