Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/16/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/16/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/16/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 07/16/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/16/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/16/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/16/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/16/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/16/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/16/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/16/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/16/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/16/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/16/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 07/16/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/16/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/16/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/16/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 07/16/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/16/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 07/22/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/22/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/22/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/22/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 07/22/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/22/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/25/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/25/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/25/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/25/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/09/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/09/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/30/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 09/30/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/17/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 11/17/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 11/17/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/21/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 11/21/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 11/21/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 01/28/2004
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 01/28/2004
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/24/2004
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/23/2004