Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/23/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/23/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/23/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/23/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/24/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/24/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/25/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/25/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/26/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/08/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/09/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/17/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/25/2003