Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 06/19/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/19/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/26/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/26/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/26/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/26/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/10/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/10/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/10/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/10/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/17/2003
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/17/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/17/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/01/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/01/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/21/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/17/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 11/17/2003