Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/23/2003
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 06/23/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 06/23/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/23/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 06/23/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 06/23/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/23/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/23/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/23/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/23/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 06/23/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/23/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/23/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 06/23/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/23/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1]* 06/23/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 06/23/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 06/23/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 06/24/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/26/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/26/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/10/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/10/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/14/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/15/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/16/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/18/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/18/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/04/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/09/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/15/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/23/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/23/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/01/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/06/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/21/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/21/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 01/27/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/05/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/19/2004