There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Salute to Veterans and the Armed Forces Act of 2003

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To improve benefits for members of the Armed Forces and veterans and for their dependents and survivors.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/24/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
07/24/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
07/24/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Benefits.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
06/24/2003Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
06/24/2003Referred to House Veterans' Affairs
Action By: House of Representatives
06/24/2003Referred to House Armed Services
Action By: House of Representatives
06/24/2003Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Veterans' Affairs, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/24/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (97)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/25/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/25/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/25/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/25/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/25/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 06/25/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/25/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/25/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/25/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/25/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 06/25/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/25/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/25/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/25/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/25/2003
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 06/25/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/25/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/25/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/25/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/25/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/25/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/07/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/07/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/07/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/07/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/07/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/07/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/07/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/07/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/07/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/07/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/07/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/07/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/07/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/07/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 07/07/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/07/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/07/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/07/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/07/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/07/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/07/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/10/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/10/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/10/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/16/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/16/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/16/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/16/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 07/16/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/16/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/17/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/17/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/17/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/17/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/17/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/18/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/18/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/18/2003
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/18/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/18/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/18/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/22/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/22/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 07/22/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/22/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 07/22/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/22/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/22/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/22/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/24/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/24/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/03/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 09/03/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/03/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/03/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/05/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/23/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 09/23/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/25/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/04/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 11/04/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 11/04/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/04/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/04/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/04/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/07/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 11/07/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/02/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/09/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/23/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/27/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 11/17/2004

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services06/24/2003 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs06/24/2003 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Benefits07/24/2003 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health07/24/2003 Referred to
House Ways and Means06/24/2003 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2569.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2569. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/24/2003)

Salute to Veterans and the Armed Forces Act of 2003 - Allows the full payment of military retired pay and veterans' disability compensation, without deduction from either (current law), without the enactment of qualifying offsetting legislation.

Repeals: (1) special compensation programs for certain severely disabled and combat-disabled military retirees; and (2) provisions requiring a dependency and indemnity compensation offset from surviving spouse annuities under the Survivor Benefit Plan.

Increases the amount of basic educational assistance for members of the Selected Reserve.

Directs the Secretary of Defense, for fiscal years after 2005, to provide a percentage increase in the higher learning cost index for determining basic educational assistance amounts.

Directs the Secretary to pay a bonus to members who, at any time during service under Operations Iraqi Freedom or Enduring Freedom, satisfied eligibility requirements for the receipt of special pay for duty subject to hostile fire or imminent danger. Directs the Secretary of Homeland to provide such bonus to qualifying Coast Guard members.

Authorizes additional appropriations for veterans' improved access to medical care.

Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to make interim payments under claims for veterans' benefits when the final decision regarding the payment of such benefits is delayed following remand by the U.S. Court of Appeals for Veterans Claims or the Board for Veterans' Appeals to the Secretary for expedited consideration.

Prohibits with respect to veterans: (1) increases in medication copayments; and (2) the imposition of health care enrollment fees.

Requires the: (1) Secretaries of Veterans Affairs and Labor to provide appropriate information concerning veterans' benefits and employment opportunities; and (2) Secretary of Veterans Affairs to prepare an annual plan for the conduct of veterans' outreach activities.

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to place the maximum individual income tax rate at 38.6 percent.