Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 06/24/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/24/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 06/24/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/26/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/26/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/15/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/15/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/15/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/09/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/24/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/24/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/14/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/16/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/16/2004
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/16/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/16/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/25/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/07/2004