Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 06/24/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 06/24/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 06/24/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 06/24/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 07/09/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/15/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 07/16/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/18/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 07/18/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/18/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 07/22/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/24/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/24/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/04/2003
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/04/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/04/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/04/2003
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 09/17/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 09/17/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/17/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/17/2003
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 10/02/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/02/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 10/07/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/04/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 11/04/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 11/04/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 11/06/2003
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 11/18/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 12/08/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 02/26/2004
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/26/2004
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/26/2004
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 02/26/2004