Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/10/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/10/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/10/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/10/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/10/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/17/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/17/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/17/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/17/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/21/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/21/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/21/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/21/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/21/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/21/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/24/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/24/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/24/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/24/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/24/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/24/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/25/2003
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/04/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/04/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 09/04/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 09/04/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 09/04/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 09/04/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/09/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/09/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/09/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/09/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/09/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/16/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 09/30/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/30/2003
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 10/08/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/06/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/19/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/03/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/04/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/02/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/02/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/20/2004