Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/27/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 01/27/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 01/27/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 01/27/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 01/27/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 01/27/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/27/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 02/05/2003
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 03/11/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/24/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/07/2003