Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 06/25/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/16/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/16/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/16/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/16/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/23/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/20/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/20/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 05/20/2004
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 05/20/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/20/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/20/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/20/2004
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/20/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/20/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/20/2004
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/20/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/20/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/20/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/20/2004
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/20/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/20/2004
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/20/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/20/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/20/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/20/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/20/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 05/20/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/20/2004
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/20/2004
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/20/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/20/2004
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/03/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/03/2004
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/03/2004
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/03/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/03/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/03/2004
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/03/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/03/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/03/2004
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/03/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/03/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/03/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/16/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/16/2004
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 06/16/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/16/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/16/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/16/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 06/16/2004
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/16/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/16/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/24/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/24/2004
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/24/2004
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/24/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/22/2004