Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 06/25/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/09/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/14/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/17/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/23/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/05/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/05/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/10/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 09/10/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/24/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/24/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/24/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/05/2004