Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/09/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/09/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/09/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/11/2004
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/18/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/18/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/23/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 03/30/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/20/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/20/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/20/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/20/2004
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/21/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/28/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/28/2004