Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 06/26/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/09/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/25/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/25/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/25/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/25/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/25/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/25/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/25/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/25/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 10/02/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/15/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/29/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/29/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/08/2004