There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Child Support Enforcement Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To allow a custodial parent a bad debt deduction for unpaid child support payments, and to require a parent who is chronically delinquent in child support to include the amount of the unpaid obligation in gross income.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/08/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
01/27/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
01/08/2003Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/08/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (54)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/08/2003
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9]* 01/08/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/31/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/04/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 06/12/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 07/09/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/25/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/25/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/25/2003

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Ways and Means01/08/2003 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Human Resources01/27/2003 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.262. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/08/2003)

Child Support Enforcement Act - Amends the Internal Revenue Code (relating to the deduction for bad debts) to allow a custodial parent to claim unpaid child support payments as a deduction.

Bars a delinquent debtor from filing an amended return in any subsequent year to reflect the subsequent payment of unpaid child support.

Includes unpaid child support in the gross income of the delinquent debtor.

Prohibits any discrepancy between the tax returns of a custodial parent and a delinquent debtor concerning whether a child support payment has been made from serving as a basis for selecting an individual's tax return for general audit.