Committees: H.R.2620 — 108th Congress (2003-2004)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House International Relations06/26/2003 Referred to
07/23/2003 Markup by
09/05/2003 Reported by H. Rept. 108-264,Part 1
House Judiciary06/26/2003 Referred to
09/24/2003 Markup by
09/29/2003 Reported by H. Rept. 108-264,Part 2
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration, Border Security, and Claims09/04/2003 Referred to
09/22/2003 Discharged from