Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/10/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/15/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/15/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/18/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/18/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/18/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/18/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/22/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/22/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/22/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/03/2003