Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 06/26/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 06/26/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 06/26/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 07/10/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/10/2003
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 07/10/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/10/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/10/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/14/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/14/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/15/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/16/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 07/16/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/16/2003
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/18/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/18/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/18/2003
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/21/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/21/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/25/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/25/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/25/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 07/25/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 09/03/2003
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 09/03/2003
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/03/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 09/03/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 09/03/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 09/04/2003