Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 06/26/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/10/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/10/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 07/10/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/10/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/14/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/14/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/14/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/14/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/14/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/14/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/14/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/14/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/15/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/15/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/15/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/15/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/15/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/15/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/18/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/18/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/18/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/18/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/18/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/18/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/18/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 07/18/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/18/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/18/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/22/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/22/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 07/22/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/22/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 07/22/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/22/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/22/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/22/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/22/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/22/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/22/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/22/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/22/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/22/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/22/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/24/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 07/24/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/24/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/24/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/24/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/24/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/24/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/24/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/24/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 07/24/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/24/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/24/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/24/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/25/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/25/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/25/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/25/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/25/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/25/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/25/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/25/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/25/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/25/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/25/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 07/25/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/25/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/25/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/25/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/25/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/25/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/25/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/25/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/25/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/25/2003
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/25/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/25/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/25/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/25/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 07/25/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/25/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/25/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/25/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/25/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/25/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/03/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/03/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/03/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/03/2003
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/03/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/03/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/03/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/03/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/09/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/09/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/09/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/09/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/09/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/16/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 09/16/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/24/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/24/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/30/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/30/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/30/2003
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 10/21/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 10/21/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 11/17/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 11/21/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/21/2004
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 01/21/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 01/27/2004
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/04/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/24/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/24/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/03/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/18/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/18/2004