Refine your search

Showing 11 of 11 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
09/30/2003 Became Public Law No: 108-87.
09/30/2003 Signed by President.
09/29/2003 Presented to President.
09/25/2003 Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report by Yea-Nay Vote. 95 - 0. Record Vote Number: 364.
09/24/2003 Conference report agreed to in House: On agreeing to the conference report Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 407 - 15 (Roll no. 513).
09/24/2003 Conference report filed: Conference report H. Rept. 108-283 filed.(text of conference report: CR H8500-8784)
09/17/2003 Conference committee actions: Conferees agreed to file conference report.
07/17/2003 To conference: Senate insists on its amendment, asks for a conference, appoints conferees Stevens; Cochran; Specter; Domenici; Bond; McConnell; Shelby; Gregg; Hutchison; Burns; Inouye; Hollings; Byrd; Leahy; Harkin; Dorgan; Durbin; Reid; Feinstein.(consideration: CR S9572 )
07/17/2003 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 95 - 0. Record Vote Number: 290.(text: CR 7/21/2003 S9643-9659)
07/08/2003 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 399 - 19 (Roll no. 335).
07/02/2003 The House Committee on Appropriations reported an original measure, H. Rept. 108-187, by Mr. Lewis (CA).