Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 07/08/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 07/08/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 07/08/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 07/08/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 07/08/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8]* 07/08/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 07/08/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/09/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/25/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 09/25/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 11/07/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/04/2004
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 02/26/2004