There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans Medicare Reimbursement Act of 2003

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for Medicare reimbursement for health care services provided to Medicare-eligible veterans in facilities of the Department of Veterans Affairs.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/08/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
07/24/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
07/14/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
07/11/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/08/2003Referred to House Veterans' Affairs
Action By: House of Representatives
07/08/2003Referred to House Energy and Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
07/08/2003Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
07/08/2003Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/08/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/20/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 04/01/2004

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means07/08/2003 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health07/14/2003 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce07/08/2003 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health07/11/2003 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs07/08/2003 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health07/24/2003 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2664.


Subjects (15)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2664. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/08/2003)

Veterans Medicare Reimbursement Act of 2003 - Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act (SSA) to require the Secretaries of Health and Human Services (HHS) and of Veterans Affairs (VA) to establish a Medicare subvention project under which the HHS Secretary shall reimburse the VA Secretary for Medicare health care services furnished to Medicare-eligible veterans in VA facilities.