Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/10/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/10/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 07/16/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/16/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/16/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/16/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/24/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/24/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/25/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/03/2003
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/03/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 09/04/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/24/2004