Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 07/09/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 07/09/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10]* 07/09/2003
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/16/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/16/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/16/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/16/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 07/16/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/16/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/16/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/16/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/16/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/16/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 07/16/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/16/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 07/16/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 07/16/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/16/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/16/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/16/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/16/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/16/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 07/16/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 07/16/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/16/2003
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 07/16/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 07/16/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/16/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/16/2003
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 07/16/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/16/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 07/16/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 07/16/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/16/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/16/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/16/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/16/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/16/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/16/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/16/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/16/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 07/16/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/16/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/18/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 07/18/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 07/18/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 07/18/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/18/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/18/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/18/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/22/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 07/22/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 07/22/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/22/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 07/22/2003
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/22/2003
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 07/23/2003
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/23/2003
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 07/23/2003
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 07/24/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 07/25/2003
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 09/03/2003
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/03/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/03/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/03/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 09/03/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/03/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/03/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/03/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/03/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/03/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 09/03/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/03/2003
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 09/03/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/03/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/04/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/04/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 09/04/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/05/2003
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/05/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/05/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/09/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 09/09/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/09/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/09/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/09/2003
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/09/2003
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 09/11/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/11/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 09/11/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/22/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/22/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/22/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/22/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/22/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 09/24/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/24/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/24/2003
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 09/25/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/25/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/30/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 09/30/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/07/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/07/2003
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 10/08/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/08/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 10/28/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/28/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/28/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 11/06/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 11/06/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/21/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/03/2004
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 02/03/2004
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 02/03/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/04/2004
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/16/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/17/2004
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/23/2004
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 03/30/2004
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/27/2004
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/07/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 09/07/2004
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/09/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/19/2004