Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 07/09/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 07/09/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 07/09/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 07/09/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 07/09/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/09/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 07/09/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 07/09/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 07/09/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 07/09/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 07/09/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 07/09/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 07/09/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 07/09/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 07/09/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/09/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 07/09/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 07/09/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 07/09/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/22/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/22/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/22/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/24/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 11/04/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/12/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/10/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/10/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/10/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/17/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/17/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/17/2004
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/25/2004
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/01/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/03/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/03/2004
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 06/03/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/03/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/03/2004
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/03/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/03/2004