Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 07/10/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 07/10/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/10/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 07/10/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 07/10/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 07/10/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/15/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/16/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/16/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/24/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/24/2003
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 07/24/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/03/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/03/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/03/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 09/03/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/23/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/23/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/23/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/23/2003
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 09/23/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 09/24/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 10/01/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/10/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/10/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 10/17/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 10/17/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 11/04/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/04/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/04/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/18/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/24/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/21/2004