Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 07/10/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 07/10/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 07/17/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/17/2003
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 07/17/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/17/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/17/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 07/17/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/24/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/24/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/24/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 07/24/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/24/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/24/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 07/24/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/24/2003
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/25/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/25/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/25/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/25/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/25/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/25/2003
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 07/25/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/25/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/25/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 07/25/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/05/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/05/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/05/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/05/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/05/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/05/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/25/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/01/2003