Refine your search

9 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
10/25/2004 Became Public Law No: 108-372.
10/25/2004 Signed by President.
10/13/2004 Presented to President.
10/08/2004 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.
09/30/2004 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/30/2004 Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
03/10/2004 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H942)
09/25/2003 Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 108-285.
07/14/2003 Introduced in House