Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 07/14/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 07/14/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 07/14/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 07/14/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 07/14/2003
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 07/14/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 07/18/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/18/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/18/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/18/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/18/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 07/24/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/25/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/25/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/25/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/25/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 07/25/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/05/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/05/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/05/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/05/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 09/05/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/05/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/05/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/05/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/05/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 09/05/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/05/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/05/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/05/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/05/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/05/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/05/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/05/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/05/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/09/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/09/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/09/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/09/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/09/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 09/10/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/10/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/17/2003
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/17/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/17/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/17/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/17/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 09/17/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/17/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/17/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/17/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/17/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/17/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/17/2003
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 09/23/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/23/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/23/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/23/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 09/23/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/23/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/23/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 09/25/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/02/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/02/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/02/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 10/02/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 10/02/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 10/02/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 10/02/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 10/07/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/07/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 10/07/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/07/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/07/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/08/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 10/16/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/16/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 10/16/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/16/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/16/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/16/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 10/16/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/16/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 10/17/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/21/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/21/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/30/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/30/2003
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 10/30/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/05/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 11/05/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 11/05/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 11/05/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/06/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 11/07/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 11/18/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/18/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 11/21/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 12/08/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 01/27/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/27/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/04/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 04/21/2004