Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 07/14/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 07/14/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 07/14/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 07/14/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 07/14/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 07/14/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 07/14/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 07/14/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 07/14/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 07/14/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 07/14/2003
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 07/14/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/14/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 07/14/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 07/14/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 07/14/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 07/14/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 07/14/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 07/14/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/18/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/18/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/18/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/23/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/25/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/25/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/05/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/05/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/05/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 09/05/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/05/2003
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/05/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/10/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/10/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/10/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/10/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/10/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/10/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/10/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/10/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/15/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 09/15/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/16/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 09/16/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/16/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/16/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/16/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/17/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/17/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 09/17/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/02/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/02/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/02/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/02/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/02/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/07/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/07/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 10/16/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/16/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 10/16/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 10/16/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/16/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/16/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/16/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/16/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/16/2003
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 10/16/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/16/2003
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 10/17/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 10/17/2003
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 10/17/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/21/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 10/21/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 10/21/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 10/21/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/21/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/29/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 10/29/2003
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 10/29/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/29/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/29/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 10/29/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/29/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/29/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/29/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 10/29/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 10/29/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/29/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 11/04/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/04/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/04/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 11/04/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 11/05/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/05/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/05/2003
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 11/05/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/05/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 11/07/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 11/07/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 11/07/2003
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 11/10/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/10/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 11/17/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/20/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/20/2003
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 12/08/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/11/2004