Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/17/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/17/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/11/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/01/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/09/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/09/2004
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/09/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/09/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 09/09/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/13/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/04/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/06/2004