Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 07/15/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 07/15/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 07/15/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 07/15/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/17/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/17/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/17/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/18/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/21/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/21/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/21/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 07/23/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/23/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/25/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/03/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/03/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 09/03/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/03/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/09/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/10/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/16/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/16/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/16/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 09/23/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/07/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 10/16/2003
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 10/21/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 11/05/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/05/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/05/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/05/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/05/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 11/05/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 11/05/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 11/05/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/05/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/05/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/05/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/05/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/05/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 11/05/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/19/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/08/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 12/08/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 12/08/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 12/08/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 01/20/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/10/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/24/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/24/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 03/02/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/02/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/02/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/20/2004
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/04/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/01/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/17/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 06/21/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/06/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/06/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/19/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/09/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/23/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/05/2004