There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Government Accountability and Streamlining Act of 2003

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Comptroller General to prepare statements for bills and resolutions reported by committees of the House of Representatives and the Senate on whether any new entities, programs, or functions authorized by the bills or resolutions are redundant with existing Federal entities, programs, or functions and could be more efficiently performed by an existing Federal entity, program, or function, and to require such statements to accompany reports on legislation.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/15/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
09/09/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Technology and the House.
Action By: Committee on Rules
07/15/2003Referred to House Rules
Action By: House of Representatives
07/15/2003Referred to House Government Reform
Action By: House of Representatives
07/15/2003Referred to the Committee on Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/15/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (47)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/03/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 09/03/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/03/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/03/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/04/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/09/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 09/09/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 09/10/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/16/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/24/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 09/25/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 10/01/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 10/01/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/02/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 10/10/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/10/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 10/16/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 10/16/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 10/21/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 11/06/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 11/21/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 02/04/2004
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/10/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/10/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/10/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/10/2004
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/10/2004
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/10/2004
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/11/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/24/2004
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/03/2004
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/03/2004
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/03/2004
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/03/2004
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 03/17/2004
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/17/2004
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/17/2004
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/17/2004
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/17/2004
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/17/2004
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/05/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/05/2004
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/05/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/22/2004
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 09/08/2004
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 09/08/2004
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 09/22/2004

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Government Reform07/15/2003 Referred to
House Rules07/15/2003 Referred to
House Rules Subcommittee on Technology and the House09/09/2003 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2743.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2743. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/15/2003)

Government Accountability and Streamlining Act of 2003 - Requires the Comptroller General, to the extent practicable, to prepare for public bills and joint resolutions (measures) reported by congressional subcommittees or committees, and submit to such subcommittees or committees, determinations of whether: (1) new Federal entities, programs, or functions are authorized by the measure; and (2) an existing entity or program carries out functions that are similar to those authorized by the measure and such existing entity or program may more effectively and efficiently perform the functions and carry out the purposes of the measure than the proposed entity or program.

Requires such statements to accompany reports on legislation.