Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/03/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 09/03/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/03/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/03/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/04/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/09/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 09/09/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 09/10/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/16/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/24/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 09/25/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 10/01/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 10/01/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/02/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 10/10/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/10/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 10/16/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 10/16/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 10/21/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 11/06/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 11/21/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 02/04/2004
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/10/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/10/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/10/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/10/2004
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/10/2004
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/10/2004
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/11/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/24/2004
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/03/2004
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/03/2004
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/03/2004
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/03/2004
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 03/17/2004
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/17/2004
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/17/2004
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/17/2004
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/17/2004
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/17/2004
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/05/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/05/2004
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/05/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/22/2004
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 09/08/2004
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 09/08/2004
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 09/22/2004