Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 07/16/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 07/16/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 07/16/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/23/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/04/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 09/04/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/17/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/17/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 09/17/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/17/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/24/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 10/01/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/08/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 01/20/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/11/2004