Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/03/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 09/03/2003
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/09/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 11/04/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 05/06/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/08/2004
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/08/2004