Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/25/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/05/2003
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/18/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 04/29/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 04/29/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 04/30/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/22/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 09/05/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 12/08/2003